Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Picchi, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Venado Tuerto, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Thinisa in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1915Born
9 Jun 194025.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
16 Nov 197055.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina
16 Nov 197055.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Horaea
20 Dec 197055.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Horaea
197560.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Plata, Argentina
31 Mar 197863.2AppointedBishop of Venado Tuerto, Argentina
14 May 197863.3InstalledBishop of Venado Tuerto, Argentina
19 Jun 198974.4ResignedBishop of Venado Tuerto, Argentina
19 Jun 198974.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thinisa in Numidia
29 Mar 199782.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Venado Tuerto, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Mario Picchi
Bishop Mario Picchi S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Venado Tuerto

EventPlace
Birth PlacePaganico

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast