Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Raspanti, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Morón, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1904Born
8 Jul 192824.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
13 Mar 195752.7AppointedBishop of Morón, Argentina
12 May 195752.9Ordained BishopBishop of Morón, Argentina
30 Jun 195753.0InstalledBishop of Morón, Argentina
22 Jan 198075.6RetiredBishop of Morón, Argentina
18 Feb 199186.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Morón, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Miguel Raspanti
Bishop Miguel Raspanti S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Morón

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast