Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Roberto José Tavella, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Salta, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1893Born
25 May 191825.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
20 Sep 193441.5AppointedArchbishop of Salta, Argentina
17 Feb 193541.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salta, Argentina
23 Feb 193541.9InstalledArchbishop of Salta, Argentina
21 May 196370.2DiedArchbishop of Salta, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Roberto José Tavella
Archbishop Roberto José Tavella S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Salta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConcordia

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1935, Number 5
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast