Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Felipe de la Cruz Muguerza, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Orán, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1921Born
21 Dec 194625.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
12 Jun 196139.8AppointedBishop of Orán, Argentina
24 Sep 196140.0Ordained BishopBishop of Orán, Argentina
21 Oct 196140.1InstalledBishop of Orán, Argentina
2 May 196947.6DiedBishop of Orán, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Francisco Felipe de la Cruz Muguerza
Bishop Francisco Felipe de la Cruz Muguerza O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Orán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVicuña, Mackeena

  • a priest for 22.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018