Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Orestes Santiago Nuti Sanguinetti, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Canelones


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1919BornMontevideo
1 Dec 194627.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
9 Jul 196040.7AppointedBishop of Melo, Uruguay
21 Aug 196040.8Ordained BishopBishop of Melo, Uruguay
2 Jan 196242.2AppointedBishop of Canelones, Uruguay
25 Oct 199475.0RetiredBishop of Canelones, Uruguay
2 Nov 199980.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Canelones, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Orestes Santiago Nuti Sanguinetti:
Bishop Orestes Santiago Nuti Sanguinetti S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Canelones

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 39.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 88
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013