Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio María Michelato Danese, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Aysén, Chile

Titular Bishop of Archelaïs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1909Born
19 Mar 192617.1EnteredMember of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
24 Sep 192718.6Simple VowsMember of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
26 Oct 193021.7Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
24 Jul 193223.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
5 Apr 194031.1AppointedPrefect of Aysén, Chile
8 May 195546.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Aysén, Chile
8 May 195546.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Archelaïs
3 Jul 195546.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Archelaïs
Sep 1958³49.5ResignedVicar Apostolic of Aysén, Chile
9 Jun 196859.3DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Aysén, Chile

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio María Michelato Danese
Bishop Antonio María Michelato Danese O.S.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Aysén

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArzignano, Italy
Ordained PriestUdine, Archdiocese of Udine, Italy

  • a priest for 35.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 53
  • vows: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017