Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Pierre Tafunga Mbayo, S.D.B.

Archbishop of Lubumbashi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1942 BornPanda-Likasi
16 Sep 197230.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
6 Oct 199250.2AppointedBishop of Kilwa-Kasenga, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
31 Jan 199350.5Ordained BishopBishop of Kilwa-Kasenga, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
10 Jun 200259.9AppointedBishop of Uvira, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
31 Jul 200866.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Lubumbashi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
1 Dec 201068.4SucceededArchbishop of Lubumbashi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Jean-Pierre Tafunga Mbayo:
Archbishop Jean-Pierre Tafunga Mbayo S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop of Lubumbashi

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lubumbashi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Jul 2008
  • s: Bollettino, 1 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,107

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013