Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaston Kashala Ruwezi, S.D.B.

Bishop of Sakania-Kipushi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1961 BornLubumbashi
14 Jul 199029.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
7 Apr 200443.0AppointedBishop of Sakania-Kipushi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
14 Aug 200443.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sakania-Kipushi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Gaston Kashala Ruwezi:
Bishop Gaston Kashala Ruwezi S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Sakania-Kipushi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sakania-Kipushi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,672

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013