Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni d’Aniello

Apostolic Nuncio to Brazil

Titular Archbishop of Pesto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1955 BornAversa, Italy
8 Dec 197823.9Ordained PriestPriest of Aversa, Italy
15 Dec 200146.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pesto
15 Dec 200146.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Congo, Democratic Republic of
6 Jan 200247.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Pesto
22 Sep 201055.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Thailand
22 Sep 201055.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cambodia
22 Sep 201055.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to Myanmar
22 Sep 201055.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to Laos
10 Feb 201257.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Brazil

MicroData Summary for Giovanni d’Aniello:
Archbishop Giovanni d’Aniello (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Brazil

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Brazil.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Sep 2010
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,097

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013