Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Franšois-Xavier Maroy Rusengo

Archbishop of Bukavu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1956 BornBukavu
19 Aug 198427.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bukavu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
22 Nov 200448.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bukavu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
22 Nov 200448.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thucca in Mauretania
16 Jan 200548.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thucca in Mauretania
26 Apr 200649.6AppointedArchbishop of Bukavu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
18 Jun 200649.7InstalledArchbishop of Bukavu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Franšois-Xavier Maroy Rusengo:
Archbishop Franšois-Xavier Maroy Rusengo (born ) Archbishop of Bukavu

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bukavu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,807
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Apr 2006
  • i: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015