Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Bukavu

Archidioecesis Bukavuensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 10 November 1959
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Congo, The Democratic Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 8,815 (3,404 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, Avenue Mbaki 18, Commune d'Ibanda, Sud-Kivu; B.P. 3324 [par Chuangugu 02], Rep. Democratique du Congo
  • Telephone: (081)31.80.621

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Kivu
26 December 1929ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Kivu (erected)
10 January 1952Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Baudouinville
Vicariate Apostolic of Kivu
Vicariate Apostolic of Kasongo (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Costermansville
10 January 1952Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Kivu Vicariate Apostolic of Costermansville
Vicariate Apostolic of Bukavu
6 January 1954Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Costermansville Vicariate Apostolic of Bukavu
30 June 1959Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Bukavu Vicariate Apostolic of Goma (erected)
Archdiocese of Bukavu
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Bukavu Archdiocese of Bukavu
16 April 1962Territory LostArchdiocese of Bukavu
Diocese of Kasongo
Diocese of Uvira (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Kivu
195082,984855,6359.7%471751,106729715ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Costermansville
Vicariate Apostolic of Bukavu
Archdiocese of Bukavu
1959232,1841,117,50720.8%241101341,73216816223ap1960
1970312,232803,71038.8%23791023,06114217017ap1971
1980485,6151,104,32844.0%29761054,624113525021ap1981
1990625,7591,369,54445.7%52921444,345118540124ap1991
1999831,5621,620,94351.3%93791724,83417343730ap2000
2000882,5911,777,55849.7%91711625,44818044830ap2001
2001882,5911,777,55849.7%95711665,31618044830ap2002
2002860,5991,346,21663.9%97901874,60219748933ap2004
2006911,5381,714,70753.2%105901954,67423049432ap2007
20121,050,0002,012,00052.2%153822354,46822650235ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013