Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Aloys Mulindwa Mutabesha Mugoma Mweru

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bukavu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1922Born
24 Apr 195432.3Ordained PriestPriest of Bukavu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
18 Dec 196543.9AppointedArchbishop of Bukavu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
20 Mar 196644.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bukavu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
15 Sep 199371.7ResignedArchbishop of Bukavu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
21 Aug 199775.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bukavu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Aloys Mulindwa Mutabesha Mugoma Mweru
Archbishop Aloys Mulindwa Mutabesha Mugoma Mweru (born 1922, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bukavu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMuzinzi

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018