Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jérôme Gapangwa Nteziryayo

Bishop Emeritus of Uvira, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1942 Born
20 Aug 197230.6Ordained PriestPriest of Uvira, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
1 Jul 198543.5AppointedBishop of Uvira, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
20 Oct 198543.8Ordained BishopBishop of Uvira, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
10 Jun 200260.4ResignedBishop of Uvira, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Jérôme Gapangwa Nteziryayo
Bishop Jérôme Gapangwa Nteziryayo (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Uvira

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKalongi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Uvira.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018