Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Bunia

Dioecesis Buniaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Dieudonné Uringi Uuci, Bishop
  • Léonard Dhejju, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 10 November 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kisangani
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Congo, The Democratic Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 22,470 (8,679 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 19, Bunia, Haut-Congo, Rep. Democratique du Congo
  • Telephone: (099)401.01.12

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Lac Albert
27 June 1922ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Lac Albert (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Lac Albert
11 December 1933ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Lac Albert Vicariate Apostolic of Lac Albert
Diocese of Bunia
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Lac Albert Diocese of Bunia
2 July 1962Territory LostDiocese of Bunia Diocese of Mahagi (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Lac Albert
1950173,861412,25642.2%864722,4143811415ap1951
Diocese of Bunia
1958285,736667,66542.8%14871012,82955193ap1960
1970281,635543,38351.8%1469833,39312121270ap1971
1980368,608703,93352.4%1755725,11911120418ap1981
1990464,781886,67752.4%3336696,7358220912ap1991
1999551,2091,027,38153.7%5019697,9883421112ap2000
2000520,3981,031,94550.4%4918677,7673420012ap2001
2001527,4391,020,80851.7%4920697,6443619112ap2002
2003474,695918,72751.7%4516617,7813116112ap2004
2006439,700710,22661.9%3912518,6212810512ap2007
2012490,844841,00058.4%5412667,4373817912ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013