Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nestor Ngoy Katahwa

Bishop of Kolwezi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1943 BornNonge
23 Aug 197027.4Ordained PriestPriest
25 Sep 198946.5AppointedBishop of Manono, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
26 Feb 199046.9Ordained BishopBishop of Manono, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
16 Nov 200057.6AppointedBishop of Kolwezi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Nestor Ngoy Katahwa:
Bishop Nestor Ngoy Katahwa (born ) Bishop of Kolwezi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kolwezi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,780

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013