Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oscar Ngoy wa Mpanga, C.S.Sp.

Bishop of Kongolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1964 BornKyolo
198823.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
26 Jul 199227.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
31 Mar 200742.3AppointedBishop of Kongolo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
9 Jun 200742.5Ordained BishopBishop of Kongolo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Oscar Ngoy wa Mpanga:
Bishop Oscar Ngoy wa Mpanga C.S.Sp. (born ) Bishop of Kongolo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kongolo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Mar 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,431

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 14 Jun 2015