Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jérôme Nday Kanyangu Lukundwe

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kongolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1929²BornKabongo
27 Aug 196233.7Ordained PriestPriest of Kongolo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
16 Jan 197142.0AppointedBishop of Kongolo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
30 May 197142.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kongolo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
31 Mar 200778.2RetiredBishop of Kongolo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
13 Jun 201182.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Kongolo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jérôme Nday Kanyangu Lukundwe:
Bishop Jérôme Nday Kanyangu Lukundwe (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kongolo

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Mar 2007
  • d: CB, 20 Jun 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013