Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Timothée Pirigisha Mukombe

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kasongo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1920BornWalungu
11 Nov 195333.5Ordained PriestPriest
29 Sep 196646.4AppointedBishop of Kasongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
5 Mar 196746.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kasongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
30 Apr 199070.0ResignedBishop of Kasongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
10 Feb 200483.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Kasongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Timothée Pirigisha Mukombe:
Bishop Timothée Pirigisha Mukombe (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kasongo

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 36.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013