Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Butembo-Beni

Dioecesis Butembensis-Benensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 7 February 1967
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bukavu
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Congo, The Democratic Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 45,000 (17,381 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: B.P. 179, Butembo, Nord-Kivu; Procure Diocese Butembo-Beni, P.O. Box 251, Kasese, Rep. Democratique du Congo
  • Telephone: (099)838.68.26

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Beni nel Congo Belga {Belgian Congo}
9 April 1934ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Stanley Falls Mission "Sui Iuris" of Beni nel Congo Belga {Belgian Congo} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Beni nel Congo Belga {Belgian Congo}
9 February 1938ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Beni nel Congo Belga {Belgian Congo} Vicariate Apostolic of Beni nel Congo Belga {Belgian Congo}
Diocese of Beni nel Congo
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Beni nel Congo Belga {Belgian Congo} Diocese of Beni nel Congo
Diocese of Beni
7 July 1960Name ChangedDiocese of Beni nel Congo Diocese of Beni
Diocese of Butembo-Beni
7 February 1967Name ChangedDiocese of Beni Diocese of Butembo-Beni

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Beni nel Congo Belga {Belgian Congo}
1950113,389400,00028.3%247492,3142911ap1951
Diocese of Beni nel Congo
1958254,323430,00059.1%562673,79514116ap1960
Diocese of Beni
Diocese of Butembo-Beni
1970440,250810,00054.4%2239617,21710123724ap1971
1980678,3521,032,00065.7%24295312,7997623723ap1981
1990816,8471,245,45365.6%5641978,42113029924ap1991
1996893,5251,363,78465.5%105461515,91714936428ap2000
20001,090,7351,570,80769.4%112451576,94729036632ap2001
20011,144,0211,557,38573.5%108431517,57617139732ap2002
20021,137,2101,722,11766.0%102491517,53118330233ap2003
2003929,4171,403,61666.2%111431546,03525639733ap2004
2004898,6531,392,53664.5%125802054,38327553533ap2005
2006993,0001,463,00067.9%132671994,98922854235ap2007
20121,173,0001,730,00067.8%1761723483,37034445546ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013