Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jean-Marie Mate Musivi Mupendawatu

Secretary Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers

Priest of Butembo-Beni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1955 Born
26 Aug 198227.1Ordained PriestPriest of Butembo-Beni, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
14 Jul 201155.9AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers
1 Jan 201761.4CeasedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Mate Musivi Mupendawatu
Father Jean-Marie Mate Musivi Mupendawatu (born ) Secretary Emeritus of Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLubero, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Please contact the Father through the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jul 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 1 Jan 2017