Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Christophe Munzihirwa Mwene Ngabo, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Bukavu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1926Born
17 Aug 195832.6Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 196539.6ProfessedPriest of Society of Jesus
10 Mar 198660.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kasongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
9 Nov 198660.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Kasongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
30 Apr 199064.3SucceededBishop of Kasongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
14 Mar 199569.2AppointedArchbishop of Bukavu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
29 Oct 199670.8DiedArchbishop of Bukavu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Christophe Munzihirwa Mwene Ngabo
Archbishop Christophe Munzihirwa Mwene Ngabo S.J. (born 1926, died ) Archbishop of Bukavu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKabare

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018