Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luc Alfons De Hovre, S.J. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}

Titular Bishop of Domnach Sechnaill


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1926BornNederbrakel
10 May 195832.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
15 Feb 198256.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium
15 Feb 198256.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Domnach Sechnaill
28 Mar 198256.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Domnach Sechnaill
20 Mar 200276.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium
4 Jun 200983.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Luc Alfons De Hovre:
Bishop Luc Alfons De Hovre S.J. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013