Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Xavier Geeraerts, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bukavu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Titular Bishop of Lagania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1894Born
15 Jul 192228.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
10 Jan 195257.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Costermansville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
10 Jan 195257.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lagania
25 Mar 195257.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lagania
8 Mar 195762.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Bukavu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
23 Feb 197176.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bukavu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Xavier Geeraerts
Bishop Xavier Geeraerts M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bukavu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMelsbroeck, Belgium

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018