Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Willy Ngumbi Ngengele, M. Afr.

Bishop of Goma, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Apostolic Administrator of Kindu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1965 Born
1 Dec 199227.8ProfessedMember of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
1 Aug 199328.4Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
25 Apr 200742.1AppointedBishop of Kindu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
22 Jul 200742.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kindu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
23 Apr 201954.1AppointedBishop of Goma, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
10 May 201954.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kindu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
19 May 201954.2InstalledBishop of Goma, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Willy Ngumbi Ngengele
Bishop Willy Ngumbi Ngengele M. Afr. (born ) Bishop of Goma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBujumbura, Burundi
Ordained BishopStadium, Notre Dame des Apôtres, Seminary, Kindu, Diocese of Kindu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Goma.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,481
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Apr 2019
  • i: CB, 20 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 20 May 2019

Quantcast