Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Albert Happe, M. Afr.

Bishop of Nouakchott


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1945 BornSendenhorst, Germany
2 Jun 197327.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
10 Jul 199549.7AppointedBishop of Nouakchott, Mauritania
1 Nov 199550.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nouakchott, Mauritania

MicroData Summary for Martin Albert Happe:
Bishop Martin Albert Happe M. Afr. (born ) Bishop of Nouakchott

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nouakchott.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,629

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013