Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges Fonghoro

Deceased

Bishop of Mopti, Mali


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1958Born
30 Dec 198729.5Ordained PriestPriest of Mopti, Mali
30 Aug 199941.1AppointedBishop of Mopti, Mali
8 Jan 200041.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mopti, Mali
22 Sep 201658.2DiedBishop of Mopti, Mali

MicroData Summary for Georges Fonghoro
Bishop Georges Fonghoro (born , died ) Bishop of Mopti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYélé

  • a priest for 28.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,677
  • d: CB, 22 Sep 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast