Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Mopti

Dioecesis Moptiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Georges Fonghoro, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 29 September 1964
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bamako
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Mali
  • Square Kilometers: 893,109 (344,963 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: B.P. 45, Mopti, Rep. du Mali
  • Telephone: 43.05.45
  • Fax: 43.00.56

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Gao
9 June 1942ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Bamako
Vicariate Apostolic of Bobo-Dioulasso
Vicariate Apostolic of Ouagadougou
Prefecture Apostolic of Gao (erected)
12 June 1947Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Gao Prefecture Apostolic of Nouna (erected)
Diocese of Mopti
29 September 1964ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Gao Diocese of Mopti

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Gao
1950400546,000.1%77571ap1951
Diocese of Mopti
19703,5621,600,000.2%232315423129ap1971
19805,8491,656,000.4%1171832419158ap1981
199011,0492,172,000.5%2202250223186ap1991
199917,6343,304,571.5%1462088112186ap2000
200018,4023,513,097.5%1572283611186ap2001
200119,2293,530,663.5%1562191510186ap2002
200220,9473,550,240.6%117181,16312146ap2003
200323,7253,434,750.7%136191,24810146ap2004
200426,3693,691,000.7%139221,19811206ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.9, 28 May 2012; data: 29 Jul 2012