Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Bamako

Archidioecesis Bamakoënsis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Jean Zerbo, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 14 September 1955
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Mali
  • Square Kilometers: 82,500 (31,865 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, B.P. 298, Bamako, Rep. du Mali
  • Telephone: 20.22.58.42
  • Fax: 20.22.78.50

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Sahara and Sudan
1868ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Sahara and Sudan (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Sahara and Sudan
1891ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Sahara and Sudan Vicariate Apostolic of Sahara and Sudan
Vicariate Apostolic of Sahara of French Sudan {Sahara nel Sudan Francese}
19 July 1901Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Sahara and Sudan Vicariate Apostolic of Sahara of French Sudan {Sahara nel Sudan Francese}
Vicariate Apostolic of Bamako
2 July 1921SplitVicariate Apostolic of Sahara of French Sudan {Sahara nel Sudan Francese} Vicariate Apostolic of Bamako
Vicariate Apostolic of Ouagadougou
15 December 1927Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Bamako
Vicariate Apostolic of Ouagadougou
Prefecture Apostolic of Bobo-Dioulasso (erected)
9 March 1937Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Bamako Prefecture Apostolic of N’Zérékoré (erected)
9 June 1942Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Bamako
Vicariate Apostolic of Bobo-Dioulasso
Vicariate Apostolic of Ouagadougou
Prefecture Apostolic of Gao (erected)
12 June 1947Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Bamako Prefecture Apostolic of Kayes (erected)
Archdiocese of Bamako
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Bamako Archdiocese of Bamako
10 March 1962Territory LostArchdiocese of Bamako Diocese of Ségou (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Bamako
19508,7551,016,499.9%2353723635388ap1951
Archdiocese of Bamako
195913,6121,259,9781.1%94352261485310ap1960
196910,300961,0001.1%9354423441528ap1971
198028,3501,902,2111.5%6333972635617ap1981
199034,7442,103,0001.7%7384577242837ap1991
199833,3313,200,0001.0%1518331,010269910ap2001
2001120,0002,600,0004.6%1028383,157391307ap2002
2002122,5802,750,0004.5%1030403,064411423ap2003
2003128,5003,500,0003.7%1135462,7934114510ap2004
2006128,7913,600,0003.6%1334472,7404311010ap2007
2012231,0004,138,0005.6%1216288,2504115210ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 8 Sep 2013