Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luc Auguste Sangaré

Deceased

Archbishop of Bamako, Mali


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1925Born
12 Sep 195429.2Ordained PriestPriest
10 Mar 196236.7AppointedArchbishop of Bamako, Mali
26 May 196236.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bamako, Mali
11 Feb 199872.6DiedArchbishop of Bamako, Mali

MicroData Summary for Luc Auguste Sangaré
Archbishop Luc Auguste Sangaré (born , died ) Archbishop of Bamako

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSégou

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 35.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Mar 2017