Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Albert Marie Auguste Bernard

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nancy (-Toul)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1916BornBéziers
21 Oct 194529.4Ordained PriestPriest of Nancy (-Toul), France
4 Dec 196751.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Besançon, France
4 Dec 196751.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Vicus Turris
10 Feb 196851.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vicus Turris
7 Jan 197255.6AppointedBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
30 Nov 199175.5RetiredBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
11 Nov 200084.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Nancy (-Toul), France

MicroData Summary for Jean Albert Marie Auguste Bernard:
Bishop Jean Albert Marie Auguste Bernard (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nancy (-Toul)

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015