Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Duperray

Deceased

Bishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1889BornTarare
20 Dec 191324.1Ordained PriestPriest of Lyon (-Vienne), France
20 Dec 194758.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France
20 Dec 194758.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamia
25 Feb 194858.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamia
24 Feb 194959.3SucceededBishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France
25 Oct 195768.0DiedBishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France

MicroData Summary for Jean Duperray:
Bishop Jean Duperray (born , died ) Bishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015