Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfred-Jean-Félix Ancel, Ist. del Prado †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lyon (-Vienne)

Titular Bishop of Myrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1898BornLyon, France
8 Jul 192324.7Ordained PriestPriest of Istituto del Prado
17 Feb 194748.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
17 Feb 194748.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Myrina
25 Mar 194748.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myrina
20 Oct 197375.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
11 Sep 198485.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lyon (-Vienne), France

MicroData Summary for Alfred-Jean-Félix Ancel:
Bishop Alfred-Jean-Félix Ancel Ist. del Prado (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lyon (-Vienne)

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013