Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Etienne Bornet

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France

Titular Bishop of Tenedus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1882Born
23 Dec 190523.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lyon (-Vienne), France
16 Dec 193755.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
16 Dec 193755.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tenedus
24 Feb 193856.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tenedus
4 Jun 195876.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France

MicroData Summary for Etienne Bornet
Bishop Etienne Bornet (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lyon (-Vienne)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyon

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017