Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude-Constant-Marie Flusin

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Claude


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1911BornFougerolles
12 Jul 193725.8Ordained PriestPriest of Besanšon, France
31 Aug 194837.0AppointedBishop of Saint-Claude, France
28 Oct 194837.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Claude, France
10 Jun 197563.7ResignedBishop of Saint-Claude, France
9 Feb 197967.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Claude, France

MicroData Summary for Claude-Constant-Marie Flusin:
Bishop Claude-Constant-Marie Flusin (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Claude

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1948, Number 118

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015