Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucien-Emile Bardonne

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Châlons


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1923BornVaux-lès-Saint-Claude
29 Jun 195127.8Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 196945.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rouen, France
27 Feb 196945.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Thimida Regia
11 May 196945.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thimida Regia
15 Sep 197249.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Châlons, France
16 Sep 197350.0SucceededBishop of Châlons, France
1 Sep 199875.0RetiredBishop of Châlons, France
3 Dec 200582.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Châlons, France

MicroData Summary for Lucien-Emile Bardonne:
Bishop Lucien-Emile Bardonne (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Châlons

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013