Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Francis-Lucien-Anatole Boillon

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Verdun


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1911BornSalins-lŔs-Bains
6 Oct 193524.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 196251.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Verdun, France
22 Jun 196251.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Maina
23 Sep 196251.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maina
31 Aug 196352.2SucceededBishop of Verdun, France
8 Jul 198675.1RetiredBishop of Verdun, France
30 Jan 199684.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Verdun, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Francis-Lucien-Anatole Boillon:
Bishop Pierre-Francis-Lucien-Anatole Boillon (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Verdun

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1962, Number 159

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013