Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gabriel-Marie Cardinal Garrone

Deceased

President Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Culture

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1901BornAix-lès-Bains
11 Apr 192523.4Ordained PriestPriest of Chambéry, France
24 Apr 194745.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux), France
24 Apr 194745.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Lemnus
24 Jun 194745.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Lemnus
5 Nov 195655.0SucceededArchbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux), France
26 Jan 196664.2AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation of Seminaries and Universities
5 Mar 196664.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Turres in Numidia
26 Jun 196765.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
26 Jun 196765.7Elevated to Cardinal
17 Jan 196866.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Catholic Education
15 Jan 198078.2RetiredPrefect of the Congregation of Catholic Education
20 May 198280.6AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Culture
19 Apr 198886.5RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Council for Culture
15 Jan 199492.2DiedPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Culture

MicroData Summary for Gabriel-Marie Garrone:
Gabriel-Marie Cardinal Garrone (born , died ) President Emeritus of Culture

  • a priest for 68.7 years
  • a bishop for 46.5 years
  • a cardinal for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015