Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Marie Molin, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bamako, Mali

Titular Bishop of Garba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1885Born
29 Jun 191126.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
2 Jul 192843.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bamako, Mali
2 Jul 192843.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Garba
23 Oct 192843.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Garba
21 Jan 194963.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Bamako, Mali
17 Aug 196782.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bamako, Mali

MicroData Summary for Paul-Marie Molin
Bishop Paul-Marie Molin M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bamako

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Martin-en-Haut, France

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017