Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie Bourchany

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lyon (-Vienne), France

Titular Bishop of Hadrumetum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1855Born
15 Jun 187823.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lyon (-Vienne), France
13 Jan 191458.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
13 Jan 191458.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadrumetum
19 Mar 191458.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hadrumetum
Oct 1924³69.5ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
27 Nov 193176.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lyon (-Vienne), France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Bourchany
Bishop Jean-Marie Bourchany (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lyon (-Vienne)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Genest-Malifaux

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 191

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017