Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisque- Jean-Etienne Marnas

Deceased

Bishop of Clermont, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1859Born
22 Dec 188829.7Ordained PriestPriest
10 Mar 191959.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Clermont, France
10 Mar 191959.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sura
30 Apr 191960.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sura
19 Mar 192162.0SucceededBishop of Clermont, France
13 Oct 193273.5DiedBishop of Clermont, France

MicroData Summary for Francisque- Jean-Etienne Marnas
Bishop Francisque- Jean-Etienne Marnas (born , died ) Bishop of Clermont

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyon

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1919, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast