Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rambert-Irénée Faure

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Claude


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1872BornSorbiers
30 May 189623.4Ordained PriestPriest of Lyon (-Vienne), France
12 Mar 192653.2AppointedBishop of Saint-Claude, France
27 May 192653.4Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Claude, France
1 Jun 192653.4InstalledBishop of Saint-Claude, France
27 May 194875.4DiedBishop of Saint-Claude, France

MicroData Summary for Rambert-Irénée Faure:
Bishop Rambert-Irénée Faure (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Claude

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015