Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Etienne Irénée Faugier

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lyon (-Vienne)

Titular Bishop of Abydus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1859BornRive-de-Gier
25 Mar 188222.7Ordained PriestPriest
19 May 192262.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
19 May 192262.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Abydus
1 Oct 192263.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abydus
4 Jun 192868.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France

MicroData Summary for Etienne Irénée Faugier:
Bishop Etienne Irénée Faugier (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lyon (-Vienne)

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013