Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre Chatelus

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nevers, France

Titular Archbishop of Leucas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1854Born
15 Jun 187823.5Ordained PriestPriest of Lyon (-Vienne), France
13 Apr 191055.3AppointedBishop of Nevers, France
29 Jun 191055.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nevers, France
7 Jul 191055.6InstalledBishop of Nevers, France
22 Apr 193277.4RetiredBishop of Nevers, France
22 Apr 193277.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Leucas
25 Feb 194388.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Nevers, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre Chatelus
Archbishop Pierre Chatelus (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nevers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Romain-le-Puy

  • a priest for 64.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017