Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Placide Lubamba Ndjibu, M. Afr.

Bishop of Kasongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1959 Born
27 Jul 199131.7Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
11 Mar 201454.3AppointedBishop of Kasongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
31 May 201454.5Ordained BishopBishop of Kasongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Placide Lubamba Ndjibu
Bishop Placide Lubamba Ndjibu M. Afr. (born ) Bishop of Kasongo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLubumbashi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kasongo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Mar 2014
  • ob: CB, 31 Mar 2014
  • c2: CB, 17 May 2014
  • c2+: CB, 31 May 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,174

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast