Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félicien Ntambue Kasembe, C.I.C.M.

Bishop of Kabinda, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1970 Born
1996²25.3Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
12 Aug 200130.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
23 Jul 202049.8AppointedBishop of Kabinda, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
27 Sep 202050.0Ordained BishopBishop of Kabinda, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Félicien Ntambue Kasembe
Bishop Félicien Ntambue Kasembe C.I.C.M. (born ) Bishop of Kabinda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKabinda, Diocese of Kabinda
Ordained PriestKabinda, Diocese of Kabinda
Ordained BishopOutdoors, Lycée Tuivuleneyi, Kabinda, Diocese of Kabinda

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kabinda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Jul 2020
  • ob: CB, 16 Aug 2020
  • c2: CB, 17 Sep 2020
  • c34: CB, 27 Sep 2020
  • c4: CB, 29 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 30 Sep 2020

Quantcast