Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valentin Masengo Mkinda

Deceased

Bishop of Kabinda, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1940Born
15 Jul 196928.5Ordained PriestPriest of Kabinda, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
2 Nov 199554.8AppointedBishop of Kabinda, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
18 Feb 199655.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kabinda, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
26 Oct 201877.8DiedBishop of Kabinda, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Valentin Masengo Mkinda
Bishop Valentin Masengo Mkinda (born , died ) Bishop of Kabinda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKahako
Ordained Bishopenceinte du Lycée Twivuleneyi, Kabinda, Diocese of Kabinda
Death PlaceLutembo

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145, Number 12,708
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 27 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 30 Oct 2018

Quantcast