Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Célestin Tshitoko Mamba

Bishop of Luebo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1956 BornKolwezi
22 Aug 198226.5Ordained PriestPriest of Kananga, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
7 Jan 200649.9AppointedBishop of Luebo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
25 Mar 200650.1Ordained BishopBishop of Luebo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Célestin Tshitoko Mamba:
Bishop Pierre-Célestin Tshitoko Mamba (born ) Bishop of Luebo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Luebo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jan 2006
  • ob/c2: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,102
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013