Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Godefroid Mukeng’a Kalond, C.I.C.M.

Archbishop Emeritus of Kananga, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1930 Born
2 Mar 195827.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
30 Aug 197140.9AppointedBishop of Luiza, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
5 Dec 197141.2Ordained BishopBishop of Luiza, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
3 Mar 199766.5AppointedArchbishop of Kananga, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
3 May 200675.6RetiredArchbishop of Kananga, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Godefroid Mukeng’a Kalond
Archbishop Godefroid Mukeng’a Kalond C.I.C.M. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kananga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTshibingu-Mukese

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kananga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 May 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018