Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Kabangu wa Mutela

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Luebo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1924Born
8 Dec 195632.5Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 196743.3AppointedBishop of Luebo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
17 Dec 196743.5Ordained BishopBishop of Luebo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
10 Dec 198763.5ResignedBishop of Luebo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
27 May 199570.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Luebo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for François Kabangu wa Mutela
Bishop François Kabangu wa Mutela (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Luebo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBasankusu

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast