Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gérard Mulumba Kalemba

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mweka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1937Born
20 Aug 196730.1Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jan 198951.5AppointedBishop of Mweka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
9 Jul 198952.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mweka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
18 Feb 201779.6RetiredBishop of Mweka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
15 Apr 202082.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Mweka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Gérard Mulumba Kalemba
Bishop Gérard Mulumba Kalemba (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mweka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKananga
Ordained BishopNear, Institut des Beaux Arts, Mweka, Diocese of Mweka
Death PlaceKinshasa, Archdiocese of Kinshasa

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,275
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2017
  • d: CB, 15 Apr 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 15 Apr 2020

Quantcast